|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 743, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2646.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1122.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 742.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|