01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 859.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/26/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |