|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2752.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1122.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 856.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|