|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 636, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2334.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2261.) (September 1).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Set for hearing September 1.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2123.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2631.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 982.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 930.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|