BILL NUMBER: SB 837CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 61 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 1, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 30, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 14, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Blakeslee FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 1102.6 of the Civil Code, relating to real property disclosures. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 837, Blakeslee. Residential real property disclosures. Existing law requires that a transferor of real property improved with one to 4 dwellings provide disclosures regarding certain characteristics of the property by means of a prescribed form. Existing law requires that, on or before January 1, 2017, a single-family residential property built and available for use on or before January 1, 1994, be equipped with water-conserving plumbing fixtures, as defined. This bill would revise the form described above to require that a transferor of real property, as described above, disclose whether or not the property is equipped with water-conserving plumbing fixtures. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1102.6 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 1102.6. The disclosures required by this article pertaining to the property proposed to be transferred are set forth in, and shall be made on a copy of, the following disclosure form: GRAPHIC INSERT HERE: SEE PRINTED VERSION OF THE BILL]