06/23/2011 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Held at Desk. | |||
06/15/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |||
06/15/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/15/2011 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 1948.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1949.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 168.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |