|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2425.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2990.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1178.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 951.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|