|
09/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2780.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|