07/05/2011 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
07/01/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/22/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/09/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 847.) (May 2). | |||
04/14/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |