03/24/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2011. | |||
03/24/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
03/22/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:50 p.m. | |||
03/17/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/17/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Page 607.) (Corrected March 18.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 611.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 168.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |