01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/26/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/04/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/31/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |