06/19/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/28/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/21/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 541.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |