01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/09/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/06/2012 | Set for hearing January 11 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
04/26/2011 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |