|
09/08/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2981.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 7).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2641.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 858.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|