|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2255.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 705.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 358.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|