|
02/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 3630.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 3562.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 543.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|