01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/05/2012 | Set for hearing January 11. Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/28/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |