|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2745.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 951.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|