01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/20/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. (Corrected June 20.) | |||
06/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1458.) (June 14). | |||
06/03/2011 | Set for hearing June 14. | |||
05/19/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and GOV. & F. | |||
05/16/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/11/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/11/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |