LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB896
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB896
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB896
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
05/05/2011
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/28/2011
Set for hearing May 11.
04/27/2011
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
03/10/2011
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
02/20/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
02/18/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.