|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 376, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 2938.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2709.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|