|
06/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 846.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|