|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 6741.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6207.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6089.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2701.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2639.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2641.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11 in E.Q. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|