|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R. & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 861.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 809.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|