01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 863.) (May 3). | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/23/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |