|
06/23/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 763.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|