07/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 3). | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |