|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2938.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 543.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|