|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 2937.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2686.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 865.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|