|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2226.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2503.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2162.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 742.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|