California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB920 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012