LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB921
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB921
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB921
Compare Versions
SB921 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB921 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB921 Amended August 14, 2012
SB921 Amended April 16, 2012
SB921 Amended August 17, 2011
SB921 Amended July 1, 2011
SB921 Amended May 11, 2011
SB921 Amended April 25, 2011
SB921 Amended March 24, 2011
SB921 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB921 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB921 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB921 Amended August 14, 2012
SB921 Amended April 16, 2012
SB921 Amended August 17, 2011
SB921 Amended July 1, 2011
SB921 Amended May 11, 2011
SB921 Amended April 25, 2011
SB921 Amended March 24, 2011
SB921 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare