LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB922
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB922
Compare Versions
SB922 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB922 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB922 Amended September 8, 2011
SB922 Amended September 2, 2011
SB922 Amended June 16, 2011
SB922 Amended March 22, 2011
SB922 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB922 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB922 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB922 Amended September 8, 2011
SB922 Amended September 2, 2011
SB922 Amended June 16, 2011
SB922 Amended March 22, 2011
SB922 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare