|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2075.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 878.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|