01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/07/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |