|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 2043.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2011
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1957.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2391.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2334.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 865.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|