|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2237.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2694.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 930.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 764.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|