California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB944 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 31, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011