|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2319.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected June 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 2. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|