LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB949
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB949
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB949
Action History
04/12/2012
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/10/2012
Set for hearing May 2.
04/09/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/06/2012
Set for hearing April 18.
02/02/2012
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
01/05/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
01/04/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.