California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB95 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill February 2, 2012

Chaptered

Bill February 3, 2012

Amended

Bill January 30, 2012
Bill June 28, 2011