|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6259.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3427.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3387.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3142.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|