LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB955
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB955
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB955
Compare Versions
SB955 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB955 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB955 Amended June 12, 2012
SB955 Amended May 25, 2012
SB955 Amended May 17, 2012
SB955 Amended March 29, 2012
SB955 Introduced January 5, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB955 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB955 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB955 Amended June 12, 2012
SB955 Amended May 25, 2012
SB955 Amended May 17, 2012
SB955 Amended March 29, 2012
SB955 Introduced January 5, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare