California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB958 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/02/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 958AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 18, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Rubio JANUARY 10, 2012 An act to add Section 33308.3 to the Education Code, relating to schools. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 958, as amended, Rubio. Schools: well-equipped classrooms: guidelines. Existing law requires the governing board of a school district to determine whether each pupil in each school in the district has sufficient textbooks or instructional materials, or both, that are aligned to the content standards adopted by the State Board of Education. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to establish standards for use by school districts to ensure that the design and construction of school facilities are educationally appropriate and promote school safety. Existing law requires a school district to have a current 3- to 5-year education technology plan as a precondition to receiving a technology grant administered by the department. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to develop guidelines and criteria for inclusion in the required education technology plan and to ensure that each school district has access to technical assistance and an approved online technology plan builder that the department determines is in compliance with state and federal requirements. This bill would require the department to develop, and the state board to adopt, for each grade and subject, guidelines for a well-equipped classroom. The bill would require the guidelines to reflect the materials and physical environment required for a classroom to be in alignment with the common core standards  and would require the guidelines to contain a specified statement  . The bill would require the department to post the guidelines on its Internet Web site. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33308.3 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33308.3. The department shall develop, and the state board shall adopt, for each grade and subject, guidelines for a well-equipped classroom. The guidelines shall reflect the materials and physical environment required for a classroom to be in alignment with the common core standards  and shall contain a statement that maintaining and equipping classrooms also reflects local needs and priorities within available state and local resources  . The department shall post the guidelines on its Internet Web site.