California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB960 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/29/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 960AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 17, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Rubio JANUARY 10, 2012 An act to add Section 89711 to the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 960, as amended, Rubio. California State University: campus-based mandatory fees. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. Existing law authorizes the trustees by rule to require all persons to pay fees, rents, deposits, and charges for services, facilities, or materials provided by the trustees to those persons. This bill would prohibit specified California State University campus-based mandatory fees from being  established without an affirmative vote of a majority of the student body voting on the fee. The bill also would prohibit those fees from being adjusted or  reallocated without an affirmative vote of the majority of the members of either the student body or a campus fee advisory committee that meets specified criteria voting on the fee, unless the vote that established the fee authorizes an alternative or automatic  adjustment or  reallocation mechanism for that fee. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89711 is added to the Education Code, to read:  89711. (a) California State University campus-based mandatory fees, other than those for instruction-related purposes, that are not specifically authorized by statute shall not be established without an affirmative vote of a majority of the student body voting on the fee. This subdivision shall not be interpreted to require current campus-based mandatory fees to be reestablished with an affirmative vote of the majority of the student body voting on the fee. (b)   89711.   (a)  (1) Except as provided for in paragraph (2), a California State University campus-based mandatory fee established through an affirmative vote of the majority of the student body voting on the fee, but not specifically authorized by statute, shall not be  adjusted or  reallocated without an affirmative vote of a majority of the members of either the student body or a campus fee advisory committee that meets the criteria specified in subdivision  (c)   (b)  voting on the fee. (2) A California State University campus-based mandatory fee established through an affirmative vote of the majority of the student body voting on the fee, but not specifically authorized by statute, may be  adjusted or  reallocated without an affirmative vote of a majority of the members of either the student body or a campus fee advisory committee voting on the fee if the vote that established the fee authorized an alternative or automatic  adjustment or  reallocation mechanism for that fee.  (c)   (b)  The majority of the membership of a campus fee advisory committee that votes to  establish, adjust, or  reallocate a campus-based mandatory fee pursuant to this section shall be comprised of students who are representatives of the student body organization of the campus, or who are selected by that student body organization. The campus fee advisory committee may include nonstudent members who are appointed or elected as authorized.