California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB960 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill February 27, 2012