|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3749.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3588.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3261.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|