04/26/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/25/2012 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3301.) | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/19/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/21/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 2994.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing March 21. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
01/17/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |||
01/13/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |