05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/21/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
01/17/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |||
01/13/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |