04/24/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 7. Page 3303.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/17/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/16/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/19/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/02/2012 | Set for hearing March 20. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
01/19/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. | |||
01/18/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |